full name |
post |
Start date |
End Date |
Start date of the 6th Board of Supervisors: May 27, 2025 End date: May 26, 2025 |
|
Non employee supervisor |
2022-05-27 |
2025-05-26 |
|
supervisory board chairman |
2022-05-27 |
2025-05-26 |
|
Non employee supervisor |
2022-05-27 |
2023-07-13 |
|
Non employee representative supervisor |
2023-07-13 |
2025-05-26 |
|
Employee supervisor |
2022-05-27 |
2024-07-18 |
|
Employee representative supervisor |
2024-07-18 |
2025-05-26 |
Start date of the 5th Board of Supervisors: May 15, 2019 End date: September 12, 2019 |
|
supervisory board chairman |
2019-05-15 |
2019-09-12 |
|
Non employee supervisor |
2019-05-15 |
2019-09-12 |
|
Non employee supervisor |
2019-09-12 |
2022-05-26 |
|
supervisory board chairman |
2019-09-12 |
2022-05-26 |
|
Non employee supervisor |
2019-05-15 |
2022-05-26 |
|
Employee representative supervisor |
2019-05-15 |
2022-05-26 |
Start date of the 4th Board of Supervisors: August 18th, 2015 End date: May 14th, 2019 |
|
supervisory board chairman |
2015-08-18 |
2019-05-14 |
|
Non employee representative supervisor |
2015-08-18 |
2019-05-14 |
|
Non employee representative supervisor |
2015-08-18 |
2017-02-06 |
|
Employee representative supervisor |
2015-08-18 |
2017-05-19 |
|
Employee representative supervisor |
2016-04-26 |
2019-05-14 |
|
Employee representative supervisor |
2017-05-19 |
2019-05-14 |
The 3rd Board of Supervisors Start date: August 18th, 2012 End date: August 8th, 2014 |
|
supervisor |
2012-08-18 |
2014-08-08 |
|
supervisory board chairman |
2012-08-18 |
2014-08-08 |
|
supervisory board chairman |
2014-08-08 |
2015-08-17 |
|
supervisor |
2012-08-18 |
2015-08-17 |
|
supervisor |
2014-08-08 |
2015-08-17 |
|
Employee representative supervisor |
2012-08-18 |
2014-07-30 |
|
Employee representative supervisor |
2014-07-30 |
2015-08-17 |
The 2nd Board of Supervisors started on January 15, 2009 and ended on September 11, 2010 |
|
supervisor |
2009-01-15 |
2010-09-11 |
|
supervisory board chairman |
2009-01-15 |
2012-08-17 |
|
supervisor |
2009-01-15 |
2012-08-17 |
|
supervisor |
2010-09-11 |
2012-08-17 |
|
Employee supervisor |
2009-01-15 |
2012-08-17 |
The 1st Board of Supervisors started on September 15th, 2006 and ended on January 14th, 2009 |
|
supervisor |
2006-09-15 |
2009-01-14 |
|
Chief Supervisor |
2006-09-15 |
2008-03-26 |
|
supervisory board chairman |
2008-04-25 |
2009-01-14 |
|
supervisor |
2008-04-25 |
2009-01-14 |
|
supervisor |
2005-12-20 |
2009-01-14 |
|
Employee representative supervisor |
2005-12-20 |
2009-01-14 |