Term | president | term of office | party |
---|
President of Germany (Weimar Republic) |
one | (Friedrich Ebert) | February 11, 1919 - February 28, 1925 | |
agent | (Hans Luther) | February 28, 1925 March 12, 1925 | No Party membership |
agent | Walter Simmons (Acting President) (Walter Simons) | March 12, 1925 May 12, 1925 | No Party membership |
two | (Paul von Hindenburg) | May 12, 1925 – August 2, 1934 | No Party membership |
Head of the German State (Nazi Germany) |
one | (Adolf Hitler) | August 2, 1934 - April 30, 1945 | |
two | (Karl Dönitz) | May 1, 1945 - May 23, 1945 | Nazi Party |
President of the German Democratic Republic (East Germany) |
agent | Johnny Dickman (Johannes Dieckmann) | October 7, 1949 - October 11, 1949 | East German Liberal Democratic Party |
one | (Wilhelm Pieck) | October 11, 1949 - September 7, 1960 | |
agent | Johnny Dickman (Johannes Dieckmann) | September 7, 1960 - September 12, 1960 | East German Liberal Democratic Party |
President of the State Council of the German Democratic Republic (East Germany) |
one | (Walter Ulbricht) | September 12, 1960 August 1, 1973 | |
agent | Friedrich Albert (Friedrich Ebert) | August 1, 1973 October 3, 1973 | German United Socialist Party |
two | (Willi Stoph) | October 3, 1973 - October 29, 1976 | German United Socialist Party |
three | (Erich Honecker) | October 29, 1976 - October 18, 1989 | German United Socialist Party |
four | (Egon Krenz) | October 18, 1989 - December 3, 1989 | German United Socialist Party |
five | (Manfred Gerlach) | December 3, 1989 - April 5, 1990 | East German Liberal Democratic Party |
President of the People's Assembly of the German Democratic Republic (East Germany) |
- | Sabina Bergman Poole (Sabine Bergmann-Pohl) | April 5, 1990 - October 2, 1990 | |
President of the Federal Republic of Germany (1949~present) |
one | Carl Arnold (Acting President) (Karl Arnold) | September 7, 1949 - September 13, 1949 | |
(Theodor Heuss) | September 13, 1949 - September 12, 1959 | |
two | (Karl Heinrich Lübke) | September 13, 1959 June 30, 1969 | Christian Democratic Union |
three | (Gustav Heinemann) | July 1, 1969 June 30, 1974 | German Social Democratic Party |
four | (Walter Scheel) | July 1, 1974 June 30, 1979 | German Liberal Democratic Party |
five | (Karl Carstens) | July 1, 1979 June 30, 1984 | Christian Democratic Union |
six | (Richard von Weizsäcker) | July 1, 1984 June 30, 1994 | Christian Democratic Union |
seven | (Roman Herzog) | July 1, 1994 June 30, 1999 | Christian Democratic Union |
eight | (Johannes Rau) | July 1, 1999 June 30, 2004 | |
nine | (Horst Köhler) | July 1, 2004 May 31, 2010 | Christian Democratic Union |
agent | Jens Bernsen (Jens Böhrnsen) | May 31, 2010 - July 1, 2010 | |
ten | (Christian Wulff) | July 2, 2010 - February 17, 2012 | |
agent | (Horst Seehofer) | February 17, 2012 - March 18, 2012 | German Union Party/Christian Social Union |
eleven | (Joachim Gauck) | March 18, 2012 - March 22, 2017 | No Party membership |
twelve | (Frank-Walter Steinmeier) | March 22, 2017 - present | |
reference material: [1] |