full name |
post |
Start date |
End Date |
Start date of the 8th Board of Supervisors: May 16, 2022 End date: May 15, 2025 |
|
supervisor |
2022-05-16 |
2025-05-15 |
|
supervisory board chairman |
2022-05-16 |
2025-05-15 |
|
supervisor |
2022-05-16 |
2025-05-15 |
|
Employee supervisor |
2022-05-16 |
2025-05-15 |
Start date of the 7th Board of Supervisors: May 8, 2019 End date: May 15, 2022 |
|
supervisory board chairman |
2019-05-08 |
2022-05-15 |
|
supervisor |
2019-05-08 |
2022-05-15 |
|
supervisor |
2019-05-08 |
2022-05-15 |
|
Employee representative supervisor |
2019-05-08 |
2022-05-15 |
Start date of the 6th Board of Supervisors: May 3rd, 2016 End date: May 5th, 2017 |
|
supervisor |
2016-05-03 |
2017-05-05 |
|
supervisory board chairman |
2016-05-09 |
2017-05-05 |
|
supervisory board chairman |
2017-05-05 |
2019-05-07 |
|
supervisor |
2017-05-05 |
2019-05-07 |
|
supervisor |
2016-05-03 |
2019-05-07 |
|
Employee representative supervisor |
2016-05-03 |
2019-05-07 |
The 5th Board of Supervisors Start date: May 7, 2013 End date: May 9, 2016 |
|
supervisory board chairman |
2013-05-07 |
2016-05-09 |
|
Shareholder Representative Supervisor |
2013-05-07 |
2016-05-02 |
|
Shareholder Representative Supervisor |
2013-05-07 |
2016-05-02 |
|
Employee representative supervisor |
2013-05-07 |
2016-05-02 |
The 4th Board of Supervisors Start date: April 27th, 2010 End date: May 6th, 2013 |
|
supervisory board chairman |
2010-04-27 |
2013-05-06 |
|
supervisor |
2010-04-27 |
2013-05-06 |
|
supervisor |
2010-04-27 |
2013-05-06 |
|
Employee supervisor |
2012-04-26 |
2013-05-06 |
|
Employee supervisor |
2010-04-27 |
2012-04-26 |
The 3rd Board of Supervisors Start date: April 30, 2007 End date: April 26, 2010 |
|
supervisory board chairman |
2007-04-30 |
2010-04-26 |
|
Shareholder Representative Supervisor |
2007-04-30 |
2010-04-26 |
|
Shareholder Representative Supervisor |
2007-04-30 |
2010-04-26 |
|
Employee supervisor |
2007-04-30 |
2010-04-26 |
The 2nd Board of Supervisors started on October 1, 2003 and ended on April 14, 2005 |
|
supervisory board chairman |
2003-10-01 |
2005-04-14 |
|
supervisor |
2003-10-01 |
2007-04-29 |
|
supervisor |
2003-10-01 |
2007-04-29 |
|
supervisory board chairman |
2005-04-14 |
2007-04-29 |